DE SB56 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill creates a Heavy Vehicle Weight Law Task Force to analyze the ramifications of restricting the weight of trucks operating in Delaware to the vehicle manufacturer’s gross vehicle weight rating. The current law has numerous flaws that have resulted in implementation delays for 15 years. The Task Force will provide recommendations of how to modify, change or delete the current law. The Bill also delays implementation of the current law, which is scheduled to go into effect on January 1, 2010, until July 1, 2011. This will provide time for the General Assembly to act on the recommendations of the Task Force.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Heavy Vehicle Registration, And To Create A Task Force To Review The Existing Delaware Heavy Vehicle Weight Law To Determine The Feasibility Of Its Implementation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-07-01 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-07-01 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2009-06-30 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2009-06-29 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 1 VACANT | |
2009-06-29 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 1 VACANT | |
2009-06-29 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate | |
2009-05-06 | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2009-04-07 | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate |