DE SB304 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This Act makes changes to nonacademic training requirements for school district and charter school personnel to help ensure that mandatory trainings are relevant to student needs and based on best practices. While nonacademic mandatory trainings are essential to addressing critical issues facing Delaware students, school personnel have expressed concerns related to the time burden and relevance of required trainings. Streamlining and modernizing such trainings could enhance their effectiveness and allow school personnel to spend more time meeting the needs of students. To that end, this Act makes the following changes to nonacademic training requirements for school district and charter school personnel:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Regulatory Provisions For Nonacademic Training And Related Resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2024-06-18 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2024-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 13 On Its Merits | |
2024-06-06 | Assigned to Education Committee in House | |
2024-05-23 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2024-05-22 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 304 |