DE SB287 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act clarifies that volunteer HAZMAT team members who are operating under the authority and direction of DNREC and are no longer employed by private industry continue to be members of the HAZMAT team and as such remain eligible for applicable workers’ compensation coverage while assisting DNREC in a voluntary capacity during a HAZMAT incident.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Workers' Compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-30 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-30 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2010-06-25 | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House | |
2010-06-24 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-24 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-24 | Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-23 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2010-06-08 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |