DE SB267 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on October 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on October 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The bill requires that third-party cost-sharing assistance utilized by patients is applied toward the enrollee's health insurance deductibles and any out-of-pocket limits. Additionally, the bill defines what constitutes a cost-sharing requirement as well as how to calculate the assistance when applying to patients deductibles and out-of-pocket limits. This bill applies to both carriers and pharmacy benefits managers with an effective date of January 1, 2024.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code To Ensure Fairness In Cost-sharing For Prescription Drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-26 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-29 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-29 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 267 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2022-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2022-06-02 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House | |
2022-05-19 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-05-04 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2022-04-14 | Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate |