DE SB238 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Under current law, a person may deposit, for a fee, an original will with the Register of Wills in New Castle County for safekeeping. The person is not required to be a resident of New Castle County, but only the New Castle County Register of Wills is authorized to store original wills.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 12 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Register Of Wills.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryant Richardson [R] | Sen. Brian Pettyjohn [R] | Sen. David Wilson [R] | Sen. Gerald Hocker [R] |
Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-27 | Re-Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2018-06-20 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House | |
2018-06-19 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-19 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 238 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-12 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 238 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-06-09 | Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate |