DE SB237 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill replaces the existing Bethany Beach Charter section with those similar uniform provisions most recently adopted in other Towns.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Town Of Bethany Beach Relating To Aldermen.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-28 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-21 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2012-06-14 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House | |
2012-06-13 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2012-06-05 | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |