DE SB220 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill Makes 9552 of Title 10, relating to Justice of the Peace Court civil judgment execution procedures, consistent with similar provisions applicable to Superior Court execution found in 5081 of the same title. Under this provision goods levied upon for the purpose of conducting a sale to satisfy all or part of a civil judgment remain available for three years. The duration of the lien or levy on chattel goods should be consistent in both the Justice of the Peace Court and Superior Court because the life of a money judgment is 5 years in both Courts.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Execution Of A Chattel Judgment.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Blevins [D] | Sen. Joseph Booth [R] | Rep. John Kowalko [D] | Sen. Gary Simpson [R] |
Rep. D.P. Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-08 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 36 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 5 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-05-05 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2010-04-28 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2010-04-27 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-04-27 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |