DE SB180 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill adds Delaware Route 4 to the list of state highways requiring certain signage for speed enforcement.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Motor Vehicle Speed Enforcement And Arrest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-30 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 3 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable |
2014-04-10 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HIGHWAYS & TRANSPORTATION) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to Highways & Transportation Committee in Senate |