DE SB180 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Section 1 of this Bill clarifies the purpose and use of the approval decal in the inspection process. Sections 2 and 6 of this revise the Statute to permit counties or municipalities to hire inspectors on a contract basis to perform inspections on their behalf, consistent with current practices for other professions related to home construction. Section 3 eliminates a power of the Board that is unworkable in light of the law applicable to the processing of complaints, investigations, and referrals for prosecution under the structure of the Division of Professional Regulation and the Administrative Procedures Act. Sections 4 and 5 of this Bill allows the identifying information that must be displayed on a licensee’s work vehicle to be abbreviated and reduces the size of the lettering required, due to cost and space constraints. Sections 7 and 8 of this Bill clarify the type of bond or irrevocable letter of credit and liability insurance required of applicants seeking licensure as manufactured home installers, and how licensees who are not self-employed may satisfy the bond or irrevocable letter of credit and liability insurance coverage requirements. These sections also clarify that employers who maintain a surety bond or irrevocable letter of credit and/or liability insurance for licensees are responsible for the licensed manufactured home installers that they employ as well as other employees assisting the licensed installer with respect to an installation.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Manufactured Home Installation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-16 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-07-01 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-07-01 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2009-06-30 | Introduced and Assigned to Manufactured Housing Committee in House | |
2009-06-29 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 1 VACANT | |
2009-06-29 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |