DE SB171 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on September 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on September 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act provides additional procedures necessary to ensure that incarcerated individuals who were residents of Delaware immediately before their date of incarceration are counted for reapportionment and redistricting purposes at their last known residence as required by law. Specifically, this Act does the following:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Counting Incarcerated Individuals For Redistricting Purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-24 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2021-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-11 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2021-06-10 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |