DE SB171 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This amendment to the Charter of Frankford establishes the date of the general election, voter eligibility and candidate eligibility. All other elections matters will be subject to State municipal election Laws.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Town Of Frankford Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-05 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-05-16 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2012-05-10 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House | |
2012-05-09 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-05-09 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-03-22 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2012-03-21 | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2012-03-20 | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |