DE HB71 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-17 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-17 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act decreases by 1% the rate of realty transfer tax to be received by the State, thereby returning to the rate that was applicable prior to August 1, 2017.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Decreasing The Realty Transfer Tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2021-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 3 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |
2021-01-14 | Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |