DE HB61 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on September 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]


This bill will add 4 new check-off donation boxes on the Delaware personal income tax return whereby individuals may choose to donate a portion of their tax refund, or designate an amount in addition to the tax they owe that will be transferred by the Division of Revenue to one of the following organizations: Food Bank of Delaware, Sussex County Habitat for Humanity, Central Delaware Habitat for Humanity, or Habitat for Humanity of New Castle County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Personal Income Tax.


Roll Calls

2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]


2017-09-14 Signed by Governor
2017-06-21 Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 2 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
2017-06-15 Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-03-28 Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
2017-03-28 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-03-15 Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-01-26 Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House

Delaware State Sources

Bill Comments