DE HB452 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act grants constable powers to certain juvenile probation and parole officers working for the Division of Youth Rehabilitative Services as designated by the Secretary of the Department of Services for Children, Youth, and Their Families, including the authority to conduct searches, seizures, and arrest of juveniles on after-care status with the Division. Such authority will be granted if the officer has met minimum requirements of training and education deemed necessary by the Department of Services for Children, Youth & Their Families and the Council on Police Training.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Related To Probation And Parole Officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-30 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (CHILDREN; YOUTH & FAMILIES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-23 | Assigned to Children; Youth & Families Committee in Senate | |
2010-06-17 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 36 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 5 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-08 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |