DE HB445 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill makes a technical correction to House Bill 53 enacted earlier this session. It would make the original intent clear that these firework devices can be sold and used on July 4, December 31, and January 1.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Fireworks; Exceptions.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Miro [R] | Sen. David Lawson [R] | Sen. David McBride [D] | Rep. William Outten [R] |
Rep. Peter Schwartzkopf [D] | Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-28 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-06-28 | Rules Suspended in Senate | |
2018-06-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-21 | Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-21 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-06 | Introduced in House and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee |