DE HB393 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Bill updates the Delaware Viatical Settlements Act by amending the license and bond requirements for a viatical settlement provider or viatical settlement broker. The Act allows an applicant seeking licensure as a viatical settlement provider to prove financial responsibility by (1) providing audited financial statements showing a minimum equity of more than 250 thousand dollars or (2) providing audited annual financial statements showing positive equity and a surety bond for 250 thousand dollars or a letter of credit amounting 250 thousand dollars. The applicant also may provide proof of financial responsibility if they are licensed in another state and have established proof of financial responsibility to said state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-23 Signed by Governor
2018-06-26 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-06-19 Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
2018-06-19 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 3 ABSENT
2018-06-19 Amendment HA 1 to HB 393 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-05-30 Amendment HA 1 to HB 393 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-05-02 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 11 On Its Merits
2018-05-01 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback