DE HB393 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill updates the Delaware Viatical Settlements Act by amending the license and bond requirements for a viatical settlement provider or viatical settlement broker. The Act allows an applicant seeking licensure as a viatical settlement provider to prove financial responsibility by (1) providing audited financial statements showing a minimum equity of more than 250 thousand dollars or (2) providing audited annual financial statements showing positive equity and a surety bond for 250 thousand dollars or a letter of credit amounting 250 thousand dollars. The applicant also may provide proof of financial responsibility if they are licensed in another state and have established proof of financial responsibility to said state.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryon Short [D] | Sen. Nicole Poore [D] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Rep. Gerald Brady [D] |
Rep. Helene Keeley [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-26 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-19 | Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-19 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2018-06-19 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 393 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-05-30 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 393 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-05-02 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 11 On Its Merits | |
2018-05-01 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |