DE HB37 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill adds various protections to the Mental Health Patients’ Bill of Rights Act, including safeguards in administration of restraint and requirement of an enhanced patient grievance system for DPC patients.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Mental Health Patients' Bill Of Rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-06-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-06-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-29 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-23 | Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2009-06-16 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |
2009-06-09 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-09 | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2009-06-09 | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced in House | |
2009-06-09 | Amendment HA 1 - Stricken | |
2009-05-13 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2009-03-25 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 11 On Its Merits | |
2009-01-14 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |