DE HB358 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This Act serves to clean up certain sections of the Boards Practice Act. Required statutory language omitted due to oversight have been added, such as standards for reciprocity, issuance and renewal of licenses, and hearing procedures. The requirements for a public Board member have been clarified. Finally, inapplicable terms, such as master elevator mechanic, have been removed.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Board Of Elevator Mechanics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-25 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-05-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2024-05-09 | Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate | |
2024-05-09 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT | |
2024-05-09 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 358 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2024-05-09 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 358 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2024-04-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2024-03-28 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |