DE HB299 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act prohibits the seller of consumer goods or services from refusing to accept cash payment, except in limited circumstances. Sales covered by this Act are those made at a retail store through an in-person transaction. The Act does not apply to sales of goods or services by electric or gas utilities, telephone, mail or internet sales, or for services provided at parking lots or garages. It creates graduated civil penalties for violations and provides consumers a private right of action to recover double damages, including consequential damages, for a second violation of the law and triple damages for subsequent violations. The Division of Consumer Protection has authority to enforce the law.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Prohibited Trade Practices Forbidding Discrimination Against Cash Payments By Consumers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-07 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-07-01 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2022-05-19 | Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2022-05-19 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2022-05-19 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 299 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2022-05-19 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 299 - Stricken in House | |
2022-05-19 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 299 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-05-19 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 299 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-03-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 3 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-02-11 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House |