DE HB241 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill expands the Employment First Oversight Commission by adding the Director of the Division for the Visually Impaired as a member, the Director of the Division of Substance Abuse and Mental Health, and other councils, committees, agencies, organizations and individuals as approved by both the Employment First Oversight Commission and the affected council, committee, agency, organization or individual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Employment Practices.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] | Sen. Harris McDowell [D] | Sen. Gerald Hocker [R] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] |
Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Rep. Earl Jaques [D] | Rep. John Viola [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-06-30 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |
2019-06-27 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-06-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-20 | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House |