DE HB22 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - Amendment HA 3 to HB 22 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - Amendment HA 3 to HB 22 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill creates the Delaware Digital Right to Repair Act. Currently when an electronic product such as a phone or electronic game breaks, it is only allowed to be repaired by the manufacturer. Parts are not available whether you are a consumer or a local repair shop. This act requires the manufacturer to make parts, documentation, tools, and updates available on fair and reasonable terms.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Digital Right To Repair Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] | Sen. Brian Pettyjohn [R] | Sen. David Wilson [R] | Rep. Richard Collins [R] |
Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Rep. Eric Morrison [D] | Rep. Edward Osienski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Amendment HA 3 to HB 22 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-05-11 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 22 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-03-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2021-03-16 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 22 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2020-12-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House |