DE HB212 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act provides a phased in approach to further the reduction of single-use plastic bags. This Act increases the minimum thickness for a plastic bag to qualify as a reusable bag from 2.25 mils to 10 mils effective January 1, 2022 and makes the restrictions applicable to stores regardless of size effective July 1, 2022. This Act also makes corrections to existing law to make it conform to the standards of the Legislative Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Recycling And Waste Reduction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 11 YES 10 NO | |
2021-06-24 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment & Energy) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 Unfavorable | |
2021-06-23 | Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-23 | Passed By House. Votes: 28 YES 12 NO 1 NOT VOTING | |
2021-06-23 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 212 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2021-06-23 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 212 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2021-06-23 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 212 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-15 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 212 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-06-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |