DE HB126 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act clarifies to whom the annual report must be sent and the date that the report must be submitted.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Clean Water For Delaware Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-03 | Signed by Governor | |
2023-06-21 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2023-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2023-05-19 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2023-05-18 | Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 6 ABSENT | |
2023-05-03 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 3 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |
2023-04-28 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2023-04-21 | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources & Energy Committee in House |