DC PR25-0926 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-26 - Resolution R25-0596, Effective from Jul 09, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 009382
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-26 - Resolution R25-0596, Effective from Jul 09, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 009382
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Closing of a Public Alley in Square 3701, S.O. 23-06220, Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Title
Closing of a Public Alley in Square 3701, S.O. 23-06220, Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-09 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-26 | Council | Resolution R25-0596, Effective from Jul 09, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 009382 |
2024-07-09 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0596 |
2024-07-09 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-07-09 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-07-08 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |