DC PR25-0817 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-09 - Approved with Resolution Number R25-0553
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-09 - Approved with Resolution Number R25-0553
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority Judith N. Batty Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Title
Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority Judith N. Batty Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-09 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-09 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0553 |
2024-07-09 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-06-17 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2024-06-11 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2024-06-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-31 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0817 Published in the DC Register |
2024-05-22 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |