DC PR25-0358 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Resolution R25-0206, Effective from Jul 11, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 010043
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Resolution R25-0206, Effective from Jul 11, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 010043
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, and 23 to Contract No. CW36154 with WM Recycle America, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Title
Modification Nos. 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, and 23 to Contract No. CW36154 with WM Recycle America, LLC Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-07-11 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-21 | Council | Resolution R25-0206, Effective from Jul 11, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 010043 |
2023-07-11 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0206 |
2023-07-11 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-07-11 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-07-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |