DC PR25-0123 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Resolution R25-0081, Effective from Mar 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 003305
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Resolution R25-0081, Effective from Mar 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 003305
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commission on the Arts and Humanities Acting Executive Director Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Title
Commission on the Arts and Humanities Acting Executive Director Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | Council | Resolution R25-0081, Effective from Mar 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 003305 |
2023-03-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0081 |
2023-03-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2023-03-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-03-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |