DC PR24-0234 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Resolution R24-0116, Effective from Jun 01, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006115
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Resolution R24-0116, Effective from Jun 01, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006115
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2019-LRSP-08A Approval Resolution of 2021
Title
Local Rent Supplement Program Contract No. 2019-LRSP-08A Approval Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Council | Resolution R24-0116, Effective from Jun 01, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 006115 |
2021-06-01 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0116 |
2021-06-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-05-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0234 Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-18 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-05-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |