DC PR24-0107 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Resolution R24-0077, Effective from Apr 06, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 003928
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Resolution R24-0077, Effective from Apr 06, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 003928
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sense of the Council Regarding the Disparate Treatment of Protesters by Law Enforcement Resolution of 2021
Title
Sense of the Council Regarding the Disparate Treatment of Protesters by Law Enforcement Resolution of 2021
Sponsors
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Brooke Pinto [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Council - Amendment (Allen and TWhite) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Council - Amendment (Allen and TWhite) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Council - Amendment (Allen and TWhite) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Council - Amendment (Allen and TWhite) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Council | Resolution R24-0077, Effective from Apr 06, 2021 Published in DC Register Page 003928 |
2021-04-06 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R24-0077 |
2021-04-06 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-04-06 | Council | Amendment (Allen and TWhite) |
2021-03-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-0107 Published in the DC Register |
2021-03-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-02-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |