DC PR23-1060 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-25 - Resolution R23-0630, Effective from Dec 15, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14808
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-25 - Resolution R23-0630, Effective from Dec 15, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14808
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications to Human Care Agreement No. CW79329 Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
Modifications to Human Care Agreement No. CW79329 Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-25 | Council | Resolution R23-0630, Effective from Dec 15, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14808 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0630 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-12-15 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-12-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |