DC PR23-0833 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 19 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

This disapproval resolution extends the Council’s review period to 45 days starting on Thursday, June 18, 2020. The proposed contract (CA23-572) will be deemed approved on Sunday, August 2, 2020, unless the Council adopts a disapproval or approval resolution prior to that time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Security Assurance Management, Inc. Disapproval Resolution of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-07CouncilWithdrawn
2020-07-07CouncilRetained by the Council
2020-06-26CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR23-0833 Published in the DC Register
2020-06-19CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback