DC PR23-0695 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Resolution R23-0364, Effective from Mar 03, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2721
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Resolution R23-0364, Effective from Mar 03, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2721
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications to Contract No. DCRL-2016-C-0005 with Georgia Avenue Family Support Collaborative Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
Modifications to Contract No. DCRL-2016-C-0005 with Georgia Avenue Family Support Collaborative Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Council | Resolution R23-0364, Effective from Mar 03, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2721 |
2020-03-03 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0364 |
2020-03-03 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-02-18 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-02-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |