DC PR23-0305 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms Safety Omnibus Clarification Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms Safety Omnibus Clarification Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28CouncilRetained by the Council
2019-05-17CouncilResolution R23-0094 Effective from May 7, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 6119
2019-05-07CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R23-0094
2019-05-07CouncilFinal Reading
2019-05-07CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback