DC PR22-1118 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-23 - Resolution R22-0644 Effective from November 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13004
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-23 - Resolution R22-0644 Effective from November 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13004
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications Nos. 2 And 3 To Contract No. Cw56028 With Food & Friends, Inc. Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Title
Modifications Nos. 2 And 3 To Contract No. Cw56028 With Food & Friends, Inc. Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-13 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-23 | Council | Resolution R22-0644 Effective from November 13, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13004 |
2018-11-13 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0644 |
2018-11-13 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-11-13 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-11-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |