DC PR22-0323 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Resolution R22-0222 Effective from September 19, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 9770
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Resolution R22-0222 Effective from September 19, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 9770
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Board Of Library Trustees C. Brian Williams Confirmation Resolution Of 2017
Title
Board Of Library Trustees C. Brian Williams Confirmation Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-06 | Council | Resolution R22-0222 Effective from September 19, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 9770 |
2017-09-19 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0222 |
2017-09-19 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-07-10 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-07-06 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0323 |
2017-06-30 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2017-06-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-05-26 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0323 Published in the DC Register |
2017-05-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |