DC CER23-0344 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Resolution ACR23-0343, Effective from Jan 15, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000840
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Resolution ACR23-0343, Effective from Jan 15, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000840
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Furthering Equality and the Prohibition of the LGBTQ+ Panic Defense Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2020
Title
Furthering Equality and the Prohibition of the LGBTQ+ Panic Defense Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-15 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0343, Effective from Jan 15, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000840 |
2021-01-15 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0343 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-12-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-11-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |