DC CER23-0333 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Resolution ACR23-0332, Effective from Jan 15, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000813
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Resolution ACR23-0332, Effective from Jan 15, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000813
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jack and Jill of America, Inc. Washington, DC Chapter Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2020
Title
Jack and Jill of America, Inc. Washington, DC Chapter Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-15 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0332, Effective from Jan 15, 2021 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000813 |
2021-01-15 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0332 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-12-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-11-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |