DC B25-0772 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - Act A25-0485 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 006760
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - Act A25-0485 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 006760
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Special Education for Young Adults in the Custody of the Department of Corrections Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Title
Special Education for Young Adults in the Custody of the Department of Corrections Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Council | Act A25-0485 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 006760 |
2024-06-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Nov 22, 2024 |
2024-05-30 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-05-29 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0485 |
2024-05-21 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 3, 2024 |
2024-05-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-04-02 | Council | First Reading |
2024-04-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-04-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |