DC B25-0036 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-36 would require the Office of Out of School Time Grants and Youth Outcomes, in Coordination with the Office of the State Superintendent of Education, to develop standards to train or recruit Out of School Time providers for students with Individualized Education Programs.
Title
Out of School Time Special Education Inclusion and Standards Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-03-31 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0036 Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0036 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/52070/Introduction/B25-0036-Introduction.pdf |