DC B25-0024 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-29 - Law L25-0035, Effective from Aug 17, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 012868
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-29 - Law L25-0035, Effective from Aug 17, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 012868
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-24 would symbolically designate the 300 block of 53rd Street, N.#. as Makiyah Wilson Way.
Title
Makiyah Wilson Way Designation Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-29 | Council | Law L25-0035, Effective from Aug 17, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 012868 |
2023-07-06 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2023-06-30 | Council | Act A25-0147 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 009087 |
2023-06-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0147 |
2023-06-27 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2023-06-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 5, 2023 |
2023-06-06 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-06-06 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-05-16 | Council | REMOVED - NOT CONSIDERED |
2023-05-02 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2023-05-02 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0024 |
2023-01-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0024 Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |