DC B24-0674 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 24-674 would direct the Department of Transportation to establish and implement an annual plan to convert tactical safety projects to permanent and durable installations and to prioritize urgent safety needs or pressing maintenance issues.
Title
Upgrading Tactical Safety Projects Amendment Act of 2022
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2022-03-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-03-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-03-04 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0674 Published in the DC Register |
2022-03-01 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2022-02-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B24-0674 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/48836/Introduction/B24-0674-Introduction.pdf |