DC B24-0279 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Act A24-0160 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 008828, Expires on Nov 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Act A24-0160 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 008828, Expires on Nov 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2021 Revised Local Budget Emergency Act of 2021
Title
Fiscal Year 2021 Revised Local Budget Emergency Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson #2) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson #1) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson #2) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson #1) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson #2) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson #1) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson #2) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson #1) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-03 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | Council | Act A24-0160 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 008828, Expires on Nov 21, 2021 |
2021-08-23 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0160, Expires on Nov 21, 2021 |
2021-08-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on September 7, 2021 |
2021-08-23 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-08-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2021-08-03 | Council | Amendment (Silverman) |
2021-08-03 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson #2) |
2021-08-03 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson #1) |
2021-08-03 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) |
2021-06-25 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-06-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-05-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |