DC B23-0883 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0584 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001141
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0584 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001141
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 23-883 closes the public alley in Square 5116, which runs from 45th Street, N.E. to Quarles Street, N.E. to accept the dedication of land for surrounding new public streets as well as remove certain existing building restriction lines.
Title
Omnibus Kenilworth Courts Redevelopment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - Postponed to 12/15/20 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - Postponed to 12/15/20 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0584 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001141 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0584 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2020-12-15 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-12-01 | Council | Postponed to 12/15/20 |
2020-11-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-17 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-11-17 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0883 |
2020-10-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-09-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2020-09-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-09-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-08-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0883 Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |