DC B23-0805 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-21 - Act A23-0372 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9845, Expires on Nov 09, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-21 - Act A23-0372 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9845, Expires on Nov 09, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. DCCB-2020-0020 with Edelson PC., Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2020
Title
Contract No. DCCB-2020-0020 with Edelson PC., Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-21 | Council | Act A23-0372 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9845, Expires on Nov 09, 2020 |
2020-08-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-08-12 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0372, Expires on Nov 09, 2020 |
2020-07-30 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 13, 2020 |
2020-07-21 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-07-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-06-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |