DC B23-0716 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Act A23-0296 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5035, Expires on Jul 30, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Act A23-0296 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5035, Expires on Jul 30, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. DCAM-19-CS-RFQ-0001P and Modification No. 01 with Soil and Land Use Technology, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2020
Title
Contract No. DCAM-19-CS-RFQ-0001P and Modification No. 01 with Soil and Land Use Technology, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Council | Act A23-0296 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5035, Expires on Jul 30, 2020 |
2020-05-05 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-05-01 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0296, Expires on Jul 30, 2020 |
2020-04-17 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 1, 2020 |
2020-04-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-03-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-03-12 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |