DC B23-0538 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Act A23-0543 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00091
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Act A23-0543 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00091
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-538 ceremonially designates the Frederick Douglass Court, SE in Square 5880 in Ward 8 as Elaine M. Carter Way
Title
Elaine M. Carter Way Designation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-10 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-11-10 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Council | Act A23-0543 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00091 |
2020-12-23 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-12-22 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0543 |
2020-12-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 24, 2020 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-10 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-11-10 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0538 |
2020-09-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-08-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0538 Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-11-05 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |