DC B23-0513 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-513 prohibits any criminal offense that demonstrates an accused's prejudice based on the actual or perceived race, color, religion, national origin, sex, age, marital status, personal appearance, sexual orientation, gender identity or expression, family responsibility, homelessness, physical disability, matriculation, or political affiliation. It clarifies that the Attorney General may bring civil actions for bias-related crimes, or when any person attempts to interfere with the exercise of federally or District-protected rights through threats, intimidation, or coercion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hate Crime Civil Enforcement Clarification Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-01-10CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-11-08CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0513 Published in the DC Register
2019-11-05CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2019-10-22CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback