DC B23-0196 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it requires the Mayor to convene a steering committee to develop and publish a Comprehensive Student Technology Equity Plan for DC Public Schools every two years. The plan must achieve a one-to-one device-to-student ratio for grades 3-12 and provide adequate maintenance and updates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

District Of Columbia Public Schools Student Technology Equity Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-06CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-09-27CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-07-12CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-03-29CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0196 Published in the DC Register
2019-03-19CouncilReferred to Committee on Education
2019-03-19CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback