DC B23-0147 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Law L23-0152, Effective from Dec 08, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Law L23-0152, Effective from Dec 08, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it establishes the Office on Deaf and Hard of Hearing and allows the Mayor to appoint the Director of the office.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement.
Title
Office on Deaf and Hard of Hearing Establishment Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-22 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Council | Law L23-0152, Effective from Dec 08, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00001 |
2020-10-23 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-10-23 | Council | Act A23-0418 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12254 |
2020-10-15 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-10-14 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0418 |
2020-09-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 14, 2020 |
2020-09-22 | Council | Amendment (Allen) |
2020-09-22 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-07-21 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-07-16 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-07-15 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0147 |
2019-10-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-09-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-01 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2019-02-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0147 Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2019-02-19 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |